This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:54:09 (UTC).

W & N Transport, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JTS Modular, Inc., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 W N Transport, Inc A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JTS Modular, Inc , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0480

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

W & N Transport, Inc. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

JTS Modular, Inc., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAVALETA, EDWIN A.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Minute Order as to JTS Modular, Inc., A California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • Notice of Settlement Unconditional - Comment: notice of settlement - entire case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Ruling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: RE: CERTIFICATE OF INABILITY FILED ON 9/17/2015 RULING: EXTESION GRANTED - RESPONSIVE PLEADING SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 10/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Certificate of Inability to Respond - Comment: FILED BY TIMOTHY G. SCANLON, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: ON 8/07/2015 PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/2/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less