Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:52:06 (UTC).

VIZCARRA VS McGRATH (C)

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 VIZCARRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against McGRATH C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Loo, Cynthia L., Shayer, Steven, Compton, James L., Fielder, John L., Benavides, Jose R., Gill, Susan M. and Bittleston, Dawn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1669

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Shayer, Steven

Compton, James L.

Fielder, John L.

Benavides, Jose R.

Gill, Susan M.

Bittleston, Dawn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VIZCARRA, LUPE

Respondent

McGRATH, STEPHEN A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

CARBONE, ROBERT F

PORTER, DAVID KEVIN

Respondent Attorneys

GELBER, JAMIE P

AZEMIKA, ANTHONY P

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 08/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/21/18 RES MOD S/S STMNT OF DEC CONTD FROM 9/21/18 11/29/18, 06/11/19

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 06/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/21/18 RES MOD S/S STMNT OF DEC CONTD FROM 9/21/18 11/29/18; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: AZEMIKA, ANTHONY P

Ruling

Ruling 01/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 11/29/2018: Judicial Officer(s): Bittleston, Dawn, Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/21/18 RES MOD S/S STMNT OF DEC CONTD FROM 9/21/18; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: AZEMIKA, ANTHONY P

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 09/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/21/18 RES MOD S/S STMNT OF DEC; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: AZEMIKA, ANTHONY P

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Mandatory Settlement Conference

4/28/16 MO: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT FROM 12/10/15 AND 03/17/2016; Parties Present Petitioner: VIZCARRA, LUPE; Respondent: McGRATH, STEPHEN A.

Motion to be Relieved / Withdraw

04/20/16 MO - MOTION TO BE RELIEVED/WITHRAW - CARBONE: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET NOM TO BE RELIEVED; Parties Present Petitioner: VIZCARRA, LUPE; Attorney: CARBONE, ROBERT F

Request for Order - Petitioner

**MO - Public: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: PET ATTY F/C CONT FROM 12/29/2015; Parties Present Petitioner: VIZCARRA, LUPE; Attorney: CARBONE, ROBERT F; Respondent: McGRATH, STEPHEN A.

Request for Order - Respondent

RESP CHANGE OF VENUE: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: RES CHANGE OF VENUE; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARBONE, ROBERT F

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 8/21/18 RES MOD S/S STMNT OF DEC CONTD FROM 9/21/18 11/29/18, 06/11/19 08/13/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 08/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/21/18 RES MOD S/S STMNT OF DEC CONTD FROM 9/21/18 11/29/18, 06/11/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 06/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 8/21/18 RES MOD S/S STMNT OF DEC CONTD FROM 9/21/18 11/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 01/18/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge-170.6 - Comment: JUDGE THERESE M. FOLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 11/29/2018: Judicial Officer(s): Bittleston, Dawn, Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 08/21/18 RES MOD S/S STMNT OF DEC CONTD FROM 9/21/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application & Order - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: TELEPHONIC DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - RESP CHANGE OF VENUE: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: RES CHANGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: HRG 8/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: PROOF OF SERVIC BY MAIL HRG 8/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: RES CHANGE OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARBONE, ROBERT F