This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 12:45:40 (UTC).

VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC VS VILLATORO

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VILLATORO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1250

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

Defendant

VILLATORO, ULICER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOCKE WENDY A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

05/24/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

05/31/2022: Order to Show Cause

Summons Issued and Filed

05/31/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Declaration

07/08/2022: Declaration

Declaration

08/26/2022: Declaration

Ruling

08/16/2022: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: of Diligence as to Ulicer Vilatoro, 1 attempt; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: of Diligence as to Ulicer Villatoro, 3 attempts; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 09/13/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKE WENDY A.