This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/25/2022 at 17:27:17 (UTC).

VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC VS ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANDERSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2305

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

Defendant

ANDERSON, MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOCKE WENDY A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/01/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/01/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Summons Issued and Filed

09/09/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

09/09/2022: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

10/06/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Answer to Complaint

10/20/2022: Answer to Complaint

Proof of Service by Mail

10/20/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Comment: Proof of Service re: Answer to Complaint; Filed By: DEFENDANT - ANDERSON, MARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Answer to Complaint; Comment: Answer to Complaint - Mark Anderson; Filed By: DEFENDANT - ANDERSON, MARK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Mark Anderson, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 12/23/2022Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division:H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VIVINT SOLAR DEVELOPER, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKE WENDY A.