This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:45:51 (UTC).

VINCENT VELASQUEZ DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 VINCENT VELASQUEZ DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Knight, Alisa R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3026

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Knight, Alisa R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VELASQUEZ, JOEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

OLCOTT, WILLIAM D

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER & LETTERS

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER & LETTERS ATTORNEY BIN

Compliance Hearing

12/21/2017 MO: Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: Status Report of Administrator pursuant to PC 12200 NOTE- 1. As of 11/21/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.

Petition for Letters

MO PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority NOTES- 1. Need proof of service. 2. Need proof of publication. 3. #4 on Waiver of Bond by Heir (form #DE-142) is incomplete. Need new Waiver of Bond by Heir form.; Parties Present Petitioner: VELASQUEZ, JOEY; Attorney: OLCOTT, WILLIAM D

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2018
  • Compliance Hearing - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Comment: RE 12200 STATUS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Compliance Hearing - 12/21/2017 MO: Compliance Hearing: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: Status Report of Administrator pursuant to PC 12200 NOTE- 1. As of 11/21/17, the 12200 Status Report or petition to close estate has not been submitted for filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Order For Probate - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER & LETTERS ATTORNEY BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER & LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters - MO PETITION FOR LETTERS: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority NOTES- 1. Need proof of service. 2. Need proof of publication. 3. #4 on Waiver of Bond by Heir (form #DE-142) is incomplete. Need new Waiver of Bond by Heir form.; Parties Present Petitioner: VELASQUEZ, JOEY; Attorney: OLCOTT, WILLIAM D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Confidential Information - Comment: Driver's license-Joey Velasquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Administration - Comment: Petition for Letters of Administration Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Petition for letters...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less