Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:07:44 (UTC).

VILLANUEVA VS VILLANUEVA (E)

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 VILLANUEVA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against VILLANUEVA E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4045

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VILLANUEVA, JESSICA

Respondent

VILLANUEVA, JESUS ISMAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

VARGAS, MARCOS ABRAHAM

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence

Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 11/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/29/17 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT **PET 1ST CONTINUANCE FROM 10/23/17** NO SERVICE; Parties Present Petitioner: VILLANUEVA, JESSICA

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney - Comment: MARCOS VARGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: EXP 11/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence - Order to Show Cause in re: Domestic Violence 11/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/29/17 PET DV/TRO MOVE OUT **PET 1ST CONTINUANCE FROM 10/23/17** NO SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing -Temporary Restraining - Comment: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Continue Hearing (Temporary Restraining Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (New)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing Domestic Violence (DV-109)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest for DV Restraining Order New No Children

    Read MoreRead Less