Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:20 (UTC).

Villanueva VS Sturgeon Services International Inc., A Corporation organized under the laws of California

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 Villanueva filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Sturgeon Services International Inc , A Corporation organized under the laws of California. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0475

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villanueva, Mark

Defendant

Sturgeon Services International Inc., A Corporation organized under the laws of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER, ARNOLD P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: Villanueva, Mark; Sturgeon Services International Inc., A Corporation organized under the laws of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without prejudice as to entire action. Filed by Arnold Peter, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Ruling/Certificate of Inability - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: re; cert. of inability to respond filed 9/10. Extension Granted Responsive pleading shall be filed no later than 10/15/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Certificate of Progress - Comment: filed by T Todd Egland, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL, AS TO, STURGEON SERVICES INTERNATIONAL, INC., A CORPORATION ORGANIZED UNDER THE LAWS OF CALIFORNIA. 8/10/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Notice - Comment: of Related Case (# BCV-15-100385)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/2/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less