This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 07:16:43 (UTC).

VILLALOBOS VS BANUELOS

Case Summary

On 01/03/2020 VILLALOBOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BANUELOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VILLALOBOS, MARIA

Respondent

BANUELOS, SAUL RAMIREZ

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: VILLALOBOS, MARIA; Served: 03/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.