This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 05:59:42 (UTC).

VILLAFRANCA, Jr. VS VILLAFRANCA

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 VILLAFRANCA, Jr filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VILLAFRANCA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0197

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VILLAFRANCA, FRANK R, Jr.

Respondent

VILLAFRANCA, LORI A

 

Court Documents

Default

Default 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: VILLAFRANCA, FRANK R, Jr.

Ruling

Ruling 12/07/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing; Party: Names: VILLAFRANCA, FRANK R, Jr.; VILLAFRANCA, LORI A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Comment: STATUS DATE 12/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketParties stipulate Judge/Referee pro tempore may hear this - Comment: matter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - Default 12/20/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Ruling 12/07/2017:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 12/07/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less