Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 04:25:22 (UTC).

VICTORIA MCCRAKEN DECEASED

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 VICTORIA MCCRAKEN DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2823

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LUND, JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAMS, TAYLOR F

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER FOR PROBATE

Petition for Letters

Petition for Letters 12/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Comment: compliance hearing re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice to Creditors - Comment: Notice to Creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal - Comment: Inventory and Appraisal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketLetters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketOrder For Probate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER FOR PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters - Petition for Letters 12/10/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication - Comment: Proof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketWaiver - Comment: Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, TAYLOR F