This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:15:04 (UTC).

PATTERSON VS CALIFORNIA CORRECTIONAL HEALTH CARE SERVICES (CCHCS)

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 PATTERSON filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CALIFORNIA CORRECTIONAL HEALTH CARE SERVICES CCHCS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1106

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VESTER L. PATTERSON SEVERAL THOUSAND HEP-C, INMATES OF CDCR

PATTERSON, VESTER L

SEVERAL THOUSAND HEP-C, INMATES OF CDCR

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTION AND REHABILITATIONS (CDCR)

CALIFORNIA CORRECTIONAL HEALTH CARE SERVICES (CCHCS)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HOOD, JOANNA B

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/02/2018 Defendants: California Department of Corrections and Rehabitlitation and California Correctional Health Care Services Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Following Plaintiff's Failure to Post Security.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION; JOSHUA NEIL HARRELL IS NOT A PARTY TO THE CASE. CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

Ruling

Ruling 12/04/2017: Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/13/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HOOD, JOANNA B; Defendant; Attorney: HOOD, JOANNA B

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: notice of change of address

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 09/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Defendants', California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and California Correctional Heath Care Services Notice of Motion and Defendants' Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant; Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security; and Requesting Entry of a Pre-Filing Order Cont'd from 08/30/17

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 08/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HOOD, JOANNA B; Defendant; Attorney: HOOD, JOANNA B

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 08/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/28/17 Defendants', California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation and California Correctional Health Care Services Notice of Motion and Defendants' Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant; Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security; and Requesting Entry of a Pre-Filing Order; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: HOOD, JOANNA B; Defendant; Attorney: HOOD, JOANNA B

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: dismissal entered on 8/18/17 is vacated

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss 09/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/02/2018 Defendants: California Department of Corrections and Rehabitlitation and California Correctional Health Care Services Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Following Plaintiff's Failure to Post Security.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROPOSED ORDER ON MOTION; JOSHUA NEIL HARRELL IS NOT A PARTY TO THE CASE. CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: AS TO VESTER PATTERSON FOR HEARING ON 9/11/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketPoints and Authorities - Comment: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Following Plaintiff's Failure to Post Security, Hearing date: 09/11/2018 at 8:30 am, Department 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: Notice of Entry FINDINGS AND ORDER AFTER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketOrder After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: and Defendants' Motion to Declare Plaintiff a Vexatious Litigant; Requiring Plaintiff to Post Security; and Requesting Entry of a Pre-Filing Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATIONS, (CDCR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: returned via u.s.p.s

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: AS TO VESTER L. PATTERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 8/30/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO VESTER L PATTERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.