Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:54:46 (UTC).

VERNA LEIGH BURRUS DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 VERNA LEIGH BURRUS DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2485

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CANALES, KELLIE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

YOUNG, MICHAEL R

O'DELL, SETH N

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: returned to Seth N. O'Dell

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: returned to Seth N. O'Dell

Order to Show Cause

Order to Show Cause 09/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- OTA RE: DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR ORDER TO TRANSFER PROPERTY INTO THE ESTATE [PROBATE CODE SECTION 850(A)(C)(D)]

Petition

Petition 08/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING= Petition for order to transfer property into the estate Notes: Need personal service on Jerry B. Harper

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MEMORANDUM

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: OPPOSITION

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Form DE-121 not provided for publication request, arrange own publication

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via attorney out basket

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Substitution of attorney returned to attorney Michael R. Young for Kellie L. Canales

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/02/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Trial; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- CMC RE: PETITION FOR ORDER TO TRANSFER PROPERTY INTO THE ESTATE [PROBATE CODE SECTION 850(A)(C)(D)]

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Citation; returned via attorneys oubasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Citation - Probate ... Atty Bin

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Citation for probate returned to attorney via outbasket

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER ATTORNEY BIN LETTERS RETAINED IN FILE AWAITING CORRECTED ORDER

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition for Probate of Will 05/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: re: either a report of status of administrator pursuant to PC 12200 et seq. or petition to close estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: returned to Seth N. O'Dell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: returned to Seth N. O'Dell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Order to Show Cause 09/27/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- OTA RE: DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR ORDER TO TRANSFER PROPERTY INTO THE ESTATE [PROBATE CODE SECTION 850(A)(C)(D)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial - Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settlement Reached; Comment: re: petition for order to transfer property into the estate [probate code section (a)(b)(d)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Settlement Reached; Comment: re: petition for order to transfer property into the estate [probate code section (a)(b)(d)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 08/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- CMC Re: Petition for Order to Transfer Property into the Estate [Probate Code Section 850(a)(c)(d)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Consent of parties or their lawyers to confer separately with settlement conference judge pro tem ret. Gary T. Friedman in department 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 08/14/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- MSC Re Petition for Order to Transfer Property into the Estate [Probate Code Section 850(a)(c)(d)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement - Comment: Mandatory Settlement Conference Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Supplement to petition for probate of will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate - Comment: 04/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Form DE-121 not provided for publication request, arrange own publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities of - Comment: Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative - Comment: Duties and Liabilities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Lost Will and for Letters Testamentary Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Petition for Letters...returned via attorney out basket

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'DELL, SETH N

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNG, MICHAEL R