This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 08:06:39 (UTC).

VENITA ANNE AYERS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED VS RIDGECREST REGIONAL HOSPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 VENITA ANNE AYERS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RIDGECREST REGIONAL HOSPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0070

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VENITA ANNE AYERS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendant

RIDGECREST REGIONAL HOSPITAL, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOON KANE

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

01/12/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

01/06/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

01/06/2023: Complaint

Order to Show Cause

01/12/2023: Order to Show Cause

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

01/26/2023: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Traffic Courtroom 2 located at 3131 Arrow Street

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, a California Corporation, via sub-service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VENITA ANNE AYERS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 4/27/2023 Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division:17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VENITA ANNE AYERS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VENITA ANNE AYERS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - VENITA ANNE AYERS, INDIVIDUALLY, AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less