This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 09:33:27 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS VS CASTLEBERRY

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASTLEBERRY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1535

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

CASTLEBERRY, TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNSTAD, BRYANT

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/20/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Timothy Castleberry via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/07/20214:58 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/20/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Burnstad, Bryant