This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 21:20:35 (UTC).

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC VS JONES

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JONES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8785

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

JONES, JEFF

JONES, JEFFREY VAUGHN

JONES, JEFFREY

JONES, JEFFREY V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMITH, STEPHEN R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Jeffrey Jones via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/10/201912:29 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less