Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:12:06 (UTC).

VELASQUEZ VS GARCIA (D)

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 VELASQUEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARCIA D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn, Benavides, Jose R., Louie, Chad A. and Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4104

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Benavides, Jose R.

Louie, Chad A.

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VELASQUEZ, JOSE ORIBLE

Respondent

GARCIA, TERESA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GORSKI, VINCENT A

GORSKI, VINCENT A.

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution Review

Family Centered Case Resolution Review 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 6/12/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 7/23/19 *1

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 07/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 6/12/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 1 MINOR

Family Centered Case Resolution Review

Family Centered Case Resolution Review 12/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 05/09/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT FROM 07/10, 07/12, 10/10 *3

Family Centered Case Resolution Review

Family Centered Case Resolution Review 10/10/2018: Judicial Officer(s): Bittleston, Dawn, Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 05/09/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT FROM 07/10, 07/12

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/9/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT FROM 07/10/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 07/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/9/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution Review - Family Centered Case Resolution Review 10/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: 6/12/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 7/23/19 *1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 07/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 6/12/19 NOTICE OF FCCR HRG 1 MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: FOR FCCR HRG 7/23/19 DIV. D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution Review - Family Centered Case Resolution Review 12/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 05/09/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT FROM 07/10, 07/12, 10/10 *3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution Review - Family Centered Case Resolution Review 10/10/2018: Judicial Officer(s): Bittleston, Dawn, Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 05/09/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT FROM 07/10, 07/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG: 10/10 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 07/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/9/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONT FROM 07/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 07/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 5/9/2018 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 7/10/2018 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less