This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 02:55:16 (UTC).

VAZQUEZ VS GUZMAN

Case Summary

On 06/09/2015 VAZQUEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GUZMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dulcich, Judith K., Camacho, Marcos R., Katz, Steven M. and Shayer, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0017

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dulcich, Judith K.

Camacho, Marcos R.

Katz, Steven M.

Shayer, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VAZQUEZ, CAROLINA

Respondent

GUZMAN, VICTOR

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Katz, Steven M.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CV, CV, PROPERTY CONTROL AND DNA TEST; Parties Present Petitioner: VAZQUEZ, CAROLINA

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ENDORSED COPY OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ENDORSED COPY OF DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 05/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: AMENDED PETITON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • DocketAmended Petition - Comment: FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Dulcich, Judith K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - REQUEST FOR ORDER - PETITIONER: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CV, CV, PROPERTY CONTROL AND DNA TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketMediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.