This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:56:06 (UTC).

VAULTZ VS VAULTZ (D)

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 VAULTZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VAULTZ D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Benavides, Jose R. and McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4730

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Benavides, Jose R.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VAULTZ, JAMIE M.

Respondent

VAULTZ, DEVELIN D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SWANSON, JEREMY D

Respondent Attorney

MARSHALL, MELLANIE S

 

Court Documents

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 02/14/2018: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: JGMT CS HC 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 2/01/18 **ALSO IN DIVISION D**

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 12/07/2017: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: DCSS NOM JUDGMENT C/S H/C 1 MINOR

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR ORDER

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 02/01/2018: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: JGMT CS HC - 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 12/07/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D; Respondent; Privately Retained: MARSHALL, MELLANIE S

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 02/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/26/17 PET MOD C/C C/V 1 MINOR *DIV A CAL ALSO*; Parties Present Petitioner: VAULTZ, JAMIE M.; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D; Respondent: VAULTZ, DEVELIN D.; Privately Retained: MARSHALL, MELLANIE S

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 12/26/17 PET MOD C/C C/V 1 MINOR cont from 02/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Motion (DCSS) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Comment: RE: JGMT CS HC - 1 MINOR CONTD FROM 2/1/18 2/14/18 *ALSO IN DIV. D*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Order Appointing Counsel for Minor(s) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: STEPHANIE CHILDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 02/14/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/26/17 PET MOD C/C C/V 1 MINOR *DIV A CAL ALSO*; Parties Present Petitioner: VAULTZ, JAMIE M.; Attorney: SWANSON, JEREMY D; Respondent: VAULTZ, DEVELIN D.; Privately Retained: MARSHALL, MELLANIE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion (DCSS) - Motion (DCSS) 02/14/2018: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: JGMT CS HC 1 MINOR CONT'D FROM 2/01/18 **ALSO IN DIVISION D**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video "Putting children first in a changing family" completed by party on "02/07/2018 11:41".

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video "Putting children first in a changing family" completed by party on "02/07/2018 11:41".

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Video: Putting Children First in a Changing Family - FCS - Comment: Video "Test Video" completed by party on "02/07/2018 08:34".

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Mediation; Comment: SET BY MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Responsive Declaration - Comment: HRG 02/14/18 DIV A / D

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Summons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) - Comment: 1ST FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: SCOTT T. POWERS/ KERN DIVORCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less