Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:10 (UTC).

VASQUEZ VS Smith

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 VASQUEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., DelPellegrino, Victoria and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0101

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ, PAMELA J

Defendant

Smith, Jacqueline

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court)

MO: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL 07/30/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, PAMELA J

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: VASQUEZ, PAMELA J; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 7720 Fernwood Avenue California City, CA 93505; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: Smith, Jacqueline; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $1,200.00; Holdover Damages: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $290.00; Other: $0.00; Total: $1,490.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: DelPellegrino, Victoria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Judgment after Trial - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - MO: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL 07/30/15: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: VASQUEZ, PAMELA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Notice of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Request/Counter Request to Set Case for Trial (UD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Answer - Comment: Jacqueline Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Jacqueline Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Jacqueline Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: VASQUEZ, PAMELA J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.15.1(c) Hearing Date: 10/8/15 Hearing Time: 1:30 PM Hearing Department/Division: BM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less