This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 07:28:23 (UTC).

VASQUEZ VS SIERRA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 VASQUEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SIERRA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Camacho, Marcos R., Palmer, William D., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0197

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Camacho, Marcos R.

Palmer, William D.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ, MIGUEL

Defendants

SIERRA, JAMES

GUTIERREZ, CHRISTINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: VASQUEZ, MIGUEL; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 650 OAK ST WASCO, CA 93280; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: SIERRA, JAMES; GUTIERREZ, CHRISTINA; Party: Names: VASQUEZ, MIGUEL; SIERRA, JAMES; GUTIERREZ, CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: VASQUEZ, MIGUEL; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 650 OAK ST WASCO, CA 93280; Awarded Against: SIERRA, JAMES; GUTIERREZ, CHRISTINA; Party: Names: VASQUEZ, MIGUEL; SIERRA, JAMES; GUTIERREZ, CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO JAMES SIERRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO CHRISTINA GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: VASQUEZ, MIGUEL; Served: 08/21/20162:15 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 650 OAK ST (BACK HOUSE) WASCO, CA 93280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less