This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:45:35 (UTC).

VASQUEZ VS CARBAJAL MONTES

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 VASQUEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARBAJAL MONTES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1927

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VASQUEZ, LLANET

Respondent

CARBAJAL MONTES, ENRIQUE

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 10/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less