This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:15:29 (UTC).

VASQUEZ CARRANZA VS BAILON IRRA

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 VASQUEZ CARRANZA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BAILON IRRA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Camacho, Marcos R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0212

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Camacho, Marcos R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VASQUEZ CARRANZA, ELVIRA

Respondent

BAILON IRRA, JOSE LUIS

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT **WITH FACILITATOR**

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: VASQUEZ CARRANZA, ELVIRA; BAILON IRRA, JOSE LUIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Camacho, Marcos R.; Comment: DISSOLUTION DATE 06/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT **WITH FACILITATOR**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketFamily Law Documents - Requested By: VASQUEZ CARRANZA, ELVIRA; Served: 12/04/20172:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less