This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:12:17 (UTC).

VASINDA INVESTMENTS, INC VS FOLLOWWILL

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 VASINDA INVESTMENTS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FOLLOWWILL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5765

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASINDA INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A AROUND THE CLOCK CARE

Defendants

AYLER, SHEILA

FOLLOWWILL, BONETA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALDON, GROVER H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of San Bernardino

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Kern

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Grover H. Waldon in Support of Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: Notice of Entry of Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: VASINDA INVESTMENTS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION D/B/A AROUND THE CLOCK CARE; Awarded Against: FOLLOWWILL, BONETA; AYLER, SHEILA; Amount; Damages: $12,350.76; Attorney Fees: $2,666.00; Costs: $499.18; Total: $15515.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO BONETA FOLLOWWILL; and SHEILA AYLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: DISMISSAL AS TO DOES FILED 12-26-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: DOES 1-20 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Default Only BONETA FOLLOWWILL; and SHEILA AYLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO SHELIA AYLER, SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO BONETA FOLLOWWILL, SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/10/2017; Served: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: January 17, 2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.