This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/14/2021 at 10:43:09 (UTC).

VARNER VS VARNER (C)

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 VARNER filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against VARNER C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gill, Susan M., Bittleston, Dawn and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3911

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Gill, Susan M.

Bittleston, Dawn

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VARNER, BEVERLY JOANNE

Respondent

VARNER, JAMES R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Respondent Attorney

THOMAS, EDWARD J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 3/8/21 PET S/S PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT ATTY F/C HEALTH INS CONT FROM 4/20/21 05/21/21, 07/12/21 08/23/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/8/21 PET S/S PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT ATTY F/C HEALTH INS CONT FROM 4/20/21 05/21/21, 07/12/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/8/21 PET S/S PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT ATTY F/C HEALTH INS CONT FROM 04/20/21 2X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/8/21 PET S/S PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT ATTY F/C HEALTH INS CONT FROM 04/20/21 1X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/8/21 PET S/S PROP CNTRL/RSTRNT ATTY F/C HEALTH INS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: E-FILED HRG 4/20/21 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300) - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketResponse - Comment: E-FILED: DISSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: E-FILED Summons (Family Law)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPetition for Legal Separation - Comment: E-FILED Petition for Legal Separation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A