Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 18:59:45 (UTC).

VARGAS VS ALBERTSONS, LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 VARGAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSONS, LLC A BUSINESS ENTITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P., Etienne, Linda S. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0441

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Etienne, Linda S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARGAS, YESENIA

Defendant

ALBERTSONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASHANI, DAVID P

Defendant Attorney

O'DELL, MICHAEL L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

6/22/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KASHANI, DAVID P; Defendant; Attorney: O'DELL, MICHAEL L

Case Management Conference

Minute Order-Case Management Conference - 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Time Estimate: 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Jury Trial 05/26/17; T/E: 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS FCMC 5/26/17 TD 6/5/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: JURY TRIAL 08/08/16; T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 5 DAYS FCMC 8/1/16 TD 8/1/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - 6/22/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KASHANI, DAVID P; Defendant; Attorney: O'DELL, MICHAEL L

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2016
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Jury fees to be posted pursuant to CCP 631 by - Comment: Failure to post will result in an automatic waiver of jury trial.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Minute Order-Case Management Conference - 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Proof of Service page 2 incomplete missing CCP code for Business. Returned via BCS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA BCS MESSENGER SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/28/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less