This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 09:03:23 (UTC).

VARGAS V. VARGAS

Case Summary

On 04/29/2009 VARGAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VARGAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6156

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VARGAS, KELLY

Respondent

VARGAS, NATHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2010
  • Docket182B Pmt: Certified Copy of Dissolution GC 70674 EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $15.00 for VARGAS KELLY (PE-1). Received from KELLY VARGAS. Receipt #547182 for amount of $15.00. Detail: 1 X $5.00 1 X $10.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment - Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS: 12/25/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Comment: DATE RECORDED:11/17/09 DOCUMENT NO:1 PAGE(S):6 JUDGMENT FOR:DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (W/O CHILDREN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2009
  • DocketOrder for Fee Waiver (Granted) - Comment: IN WHOLE BY COMMISSIONER PRITCHARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2009
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Fee - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (W/O CHILDREN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default - Comment: W/PROPOSED JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED:AMENDED SUMMONS WITH STANDARD RESTRAING ORDERS, AMENDED PETITION; BLANK RESPONSE-MARRIAGE WHO SERVED:NATHAN VARGAS HOW SERVED:PERSONAL SERVICE DATE SERVED:6/24/09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RESPONSE 1. NO POS 2. NO FILING FEE 3. DATE MISSING NEXT TO SIGNATURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • DocketAmended Petition - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2009
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: kimh

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • DocketOrder for Fee Waiver (Granted) - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Fee - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less