This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 00:47:25 (UTC).

VARELA VS VARELA

Case Summary

On 05/05/2015 VARELA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VARELA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8505

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VARELA, NATHAN R

Respondents

VARELA, KEVEN L

DECKER VARELA, KEVEN L

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Court Trial

Court Trial 06/14/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: VARELA, NATHAN R; Respondent: VARELA, KEVEN L

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 04/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VARELA, NATHAN R; Respondent: VARELA, KEVEN L

Review

Review 03/29/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VARELA, NATHAN R

Review

Review 02/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VARELA, NATHAN R; Respondent: VARELA, KEVEN L

Review

Review 01/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VARELA, NATHAN R; Respondent: VARELA, KEVEN L

Review

**MO - Continuance: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VARELA, NATHAN R; Respondent: VARELA, KEVEN L

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/07/2016: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: VARELA, NATHAN R; Respondent: VARELA, KEVEN L

Ex Parte Hearing

MO - EX PARTE FILED 7-15-16: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: VARELA, NATHAN R; Respondent: VARELA, KEVEN L

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: OAH 3/29/17

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: OAH 2/8/17

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: OAH 1/25/17

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: OAH 9/7/16

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re Contempt (Respondent) - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketExhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 12/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Respondent - Request for Order - Respondent 11/27/2019: Request for Order - Respondent 12/11/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Ruling 11/15/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Ruling 11/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Hearing - MO - EX PARTE FILED 7-15-16: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketEx Parte Compliance - Comment: Hearing Date: 7/18/2016 Hearing Time: 1:15PM Hearing Department/Division: BR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: PETITIONER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: PETITIONER'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.