This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 16:30:22 (UTC).

VANESSA PEREZ VS LANDMARK BUILDERS GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 VANESSA PEREZ filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LANDMARK BUILDERS GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3274

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CISNEROS, JOSE

RAMOS, NOEMIH ABIGAIL

RAZO, RUBEN

LAZO, ANTONIO RAMOS

SOTO, JOSE L.

LANDEROS MARTINEZ, JESUS ANTONIO

PEREZ, ALBERTO VILLASANA

HUAPE, LUIS

RODRIGUEZ, PEDRO

HUSEIN, SHADY A.

AGUILAR, ESPERANZA Z.

GRAY, MICHAEL

EVANS, NICOLE

ALVAREZ, ROXANA

SAMANIEGO, THERESA

RIVERA, INGRID M.

MEZA, CECILIA

MALDONADO, JOSE

NAVARRO, SAUL MENA

VANESSA PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELTON, JEFFREY T

Other Attorneys

O'BRIEN, JILLISA L.

HABIBI, BAHAREH

PAIGE, ROBERT N

COPPOLA, CARLO A

SNODGRASS, JENNIFER L

TANGONAN, KENYA T

TAYLOR, SANDRA F

MCELROY, JULIE D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/4/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:17

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 08/04/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Comment: continued from 08/04/2020

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Notice of Association of Counsel must have signature of current Attorney of record and signature of Associating Attorney. Please correct and resubmit.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Douglas Jacobs Re: Stipulation and Order Reason: Please provide a standalone Order for Judge to sign. Also, we are missing the $1,000.00 Complex Fee for Landmark and $1000.00 for CRE LLC, which has to be paid in order to file the Stipulation and Order. Please correct and resubmit with fees together with Proof of Service. Thank you.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: No Special Master has been appointed in this matter.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Request for Default @12-1b party does not fully conform to the Cross-complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: All Attorneys For: Case Management Statement Reason: Each party must submit Mandatory Judicial Council Form CM-110.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 01/06/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 08/04/20, 10/06/20

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Stipulation and order, this is a complex case, filing fees are $435 plus the complex fee of $1,000. Jury fees to be paid when answer is filed.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Notice of Jury Deposit and fees were accepted in envelope #05805580

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Stipulation and Order, First Appearance fees are required for All American Carpet, Inc., Entry of Default date needs to be corrected.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Notice, No jury fee of $150 was included with the filing. Please correct selecting filing code " Notice of Jury Deposit"

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Proof of Service, Duplicate filing.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Management Statement (Envelope Id #6104244) Please use mandatory form CM-110. You can submit this as a supplement to it, please adjust your document title before resubmitting. Thank you.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 04/07/2021: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont from 01/06/21

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Re: Notice of Stay of Proceedings form CM-180 needs to be filed.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/05/201910:45 AM; Served: 11/27/201912:40 PM; Served: 11/27/201912:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR, SANDRA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HABIBI BAHAREH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNODGRASS, JENNIFER L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANGONAN KENYA T.