Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:15:19 (UTC).

VALLEY SPRINGS APARTMENTS VS ARRIAGA ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 VALLEY SPRINGS APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARRIAGA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0951

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLEY SPRINGS APARTMENTS

Defendants

ARRIAGA, FERNANDO

ARRIAGA, JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOUZANE, JOHN E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2015
  • Cause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: VALLEY SPRINGS APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: ARRIAGA, JONATHAN; ARRIAGA, FERNANDO; Must Pay; Past Due Rent: $746.00; Holdover Damages: $1,198.35; Attorney Fees: $350.00; Costs: $415.00; Total: $2,709.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: VALLEY SPRINGS APARTMENTS; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 400 WHITE LN APT 7, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: ARRIAGA, JONATHAN; ARRIAGA, FERNANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Final Judgment/Unlawful Detainer - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Cause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 09/11/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Declaration for Default - Comment: Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to Jonathan Arriaga, Fernando Arriaga

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Substitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: HG Long New Attorney: John E Bouzane ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Fernando Arriaga.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Jonathan Arriaga.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to All unknown occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: VALLEY SPRINGS APARTMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 400 WHITE LN APT 7 BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned at counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: H.G. Long Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less