This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:35:57 (UTC).

VALENZUELA VS LEAVITT'S FREIGHT SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 VALENZUELA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEAVITT'S FREIGHT SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2378

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PADILLA, LORENA

ESTATE OF ABEL VALENZUELA, BY AND THROUGH ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, CARMEN VALENZUELA

VALENZUELA, JOSE

VALENZUELA, FERNANDO

VALENZUELA, CARMEN

VALENZUELA, VERONICA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LEAVITT'S FREIGHT SERVICE, INC., A CORPORATION

BOYLE, DAVID LOWELL

TRI-COUNTY MEDICALTRANSPORT, INC, A CORPORATION

PICAZO, REYES HECTOR

Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LEAVITT'S FREIGHT SERVICE, INC

TRI-COUNTY MEDICAL TRANSPORT, INC

BOYLE, DAVID LOWELL

PICAZO, REYES HECTOR

REYES PICAZO, HECTOR

BOYLE, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LUCAS, SPENCER R.

FINE, MICKEY L

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

ROOT, DANIEL M

O'BRIEN, PATRICK K

O'BRIEN, PATRICK KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Minute Order 5/18/18: Minute Order 5/24/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication 04/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/22/17 Defendants/Cross-Complainants, TRI-COUNTY MEDICAL TRANSPORTATION, INC. and REYES HECTOR PICAZO (erroneously sued as Hector Reyes Picazo) Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication ResID: 28701; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: ROOT, DANIEL M; Defendant; Attorney: ROOT, DANIEL M; Cross Defendant; Attorney: ROOT, DANIEL M; Cross Defendant; Attorney: ROOT, DANIEL M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: ROOT, DANIEL M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: ROOT, DANIEL M

Ruling

Ruling 03/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 04:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 11/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 7-10 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: FCMC 11/13/18; JURY TRIAL 11/13/18; T/E 7-10 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice on cross-complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With prejudice as to plaintiff's complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to Complaint only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With prejudice as to cross-complaint filed by Tri-County Medical Transport and Reyes Picazo filed on July 10, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s):Cannot be as to entire action due to cross-complaints having been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Minute Order 5/18/18: Minute Order 5/24/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Transfer of Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: 11/28/2017 AT 8:15 AM IN DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: VALENZUELA, CARMEN, VALENZUELA, VERONICA, PADILLA, LORENA, VALENZUELA, JOSE, VALENZUELA, FERNANDO, ESTATE OF ABEL VALENZUELA, BY AND THROUGH ITS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, CARMEN VALENZUELA; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRecords Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: TRANSFER FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SEE ENTRY 2181

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Receipt of Record

    Read MoreRead Less