This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 23:23:22 (UTC).

VALENZUELA VS GLASS

Case Summary

On 05/17/2016 VALENZUELA filed an Other lawsuit against GLASS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Woodward, Cory J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0157

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Woodward, Cory J.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

VALENZUELA, CRUZ

VALENZUELA, SAMANTHA

Respondents

GARCIA-HERRERA, JULIO

GLASS, CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STEIN, ROGER I

Respondent Attorney

ANDERSON, LESLIE

 

Court Documents

Review

MO - REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: GLASS, CHRISTINA; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Confirmation of Special Setting

MO - CONFIRMATION OF SPECIAL SETTING: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO - CONT RFO RE CHILD VISITATION FILED 5-18-16: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VALENZUELA, CRUZ; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Petitioner: VALENZUELA, SAMANTHA; Respondent: GLASS, CHRISTINA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Mediation Appointment

6/29/16 Cont Pet RFO RE: V Filed on 5/18/16: Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO - PET RFO FILED 5-18-16: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: VALENZUELA, CRUZ; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Petitioner: VALENZUELA, SAMANTHA; Respondent: GLASS, CHRISTINA; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Review - MO - REVIEW: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Dropped; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent: GLASS, CHRISTINA; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Exhibit(s) List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - MO - PET RFO FILED 5-18-16: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: VALENZUELA, CRUZ; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Petitioner: VALENZUELA, SAMANTHA; Respondent: GLASS, CHRISTINA; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Confirmation of Special Setting - MO - CONFIRMATION OF SPECIAL SETTING: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Respondent; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation Appointment - 6/29/16 Cont Pet RFO RE: V Filed on 5/18/16: Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Woodward, Cory J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VALENZUELA, CRUZ; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Petitioner: VALENZUELA, SAMANTHA; Respondent: GLASS, CHRISTINA; Attorney: ANDERSON, LESLIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Responsive Declaration - Comment: to Request for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Mediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - MO - CONT RFO RE CHILD VISITATION FILED 5-18-16: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VALENZUELA, CRUZ; Attorney: STEIN, ROGER I; Petitioner: VALENZUELA, SAMANTHA; Respondent: GLASS, CHRISTINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Petition for Grandparent Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.