Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:02:20 (UTC).

VALENTINE VS VALENTINE

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 VALENTINE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VALENTINE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1681

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VALENTINE, KIMBERLY A

Respondent

VALENTINE, CHARLES D

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: OSC

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Mail Returned Undelivered - Comment: DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 4/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: RETURNED VIA DEFAULT BOX - LETTER SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Stipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less