Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 10:54:42 (UTC).

VALDOVINOS SANCHEZ VS PEP BOYS AUTO

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 VALDOVINOS SANCHEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEP BOYS AUTO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2328

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valdovinos Sanchez, Juan B

Defendants

Pep Boys Auto

THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 01/08/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: $4,250.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA; Awarded Against: VALDOVINOS SANCHEZ, JUAN B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 01/08/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: $4,250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: csc lawyers inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: VALDOVINOS SANCHEZ, JUAN B; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim - Comment: Declaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Plaintiffs Claim and Order (SC-100)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where PEP BOYS INC is a litigant