This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:57:20 (UTC).

VALDEZ VS PAREDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 VALDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAREDEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1277

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALDEZ, DANIEL G

Defendants

PAREDEZ, LORRAINE

PAREDEZ, GABRIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2015
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Certified Mail Claimed - Comment: As to Lorraine Paredez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Certified Mail Claimed - Comment: As to Garbiel Paredez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO LORRAINE PAREDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO GABRIEL PAREDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less