This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:07:50 (UTC).

VALDEZ VS JORDAN

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 VALDEZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JORDAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5667

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALDEZ, DENNIS L

Defendant

JORDAN, JENNIFER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: VALDEZ, DENNIS L; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 614 Irene St. Bakersfield, Ca. 93305; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: JORDAN, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURN VIA V BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: Jennifer Jordan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Jennifer Jordan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: VALDEZ, DENNIS L; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 614 IRENE ST., BAKERSFIELD, CA 93305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.