This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 01:33:47 (UTC).

VALDEZ VS BASURTO

Case Summary

On 05/18/2015 VALDEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BASURTO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. and Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0005

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO

Respondent

BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DULCICH, JOHN S

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO; Respondent: BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 08/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: Modify Child Custody & Visitation; Parties Present Petitioner: VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO; Respondent: BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Court Trial

09/20/2016 MO: Court Trial: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO; Respondent: BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

Court Trial

Court Trial 09/16/2016: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Trial; Parties Present Petitioner: VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO; Respondent: BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 09/08/2016: Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DCSS NOM C/S H/C INTERVENE AND STND ORDERS 4 MINORS

Mandatory Settlement Conference

07/07/16 MO - Mandatory Settlement Conference: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO; Respondent: BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

Ruling

3/23/16 MO: RULING RE: JUDGMENT, CHILD SUPPORT AND HEALTH CARE: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO

Review

MO:Review: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO; Respondent: BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

Review

02/26/16 MO: Review: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Reset; Comment: status of custody and visitation; Parties Present Respondent: BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

Ruling

MO - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO - Petitioner's Request for Order: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO; Respondent: BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

Request for Order - Petitioner

MO - Request for Order (Petitioner): Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Petitioner: VALDEZ, MARCOS BASURTO; Respondent: BASURTO, YOLANDA AYON

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Interpreter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: Hearing of: 09/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 09/15/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: Mediation Date: 09/12/2017 Hearing Date: 09/15/2017 Hearing Date: 9:00 a.m. Department: A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 08/18/2017: Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: Modify Child Custody & Visitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketNo Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: HRG 07/10/15 FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Re: Child Custody, Child Support and Property Restraint Mediation: 7/7/2015 at 9:00 am Hearing: 7/10/2015 at 9:00 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.