This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:48:06 (UTC).

VALADEZ VS MARQUEZ

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 VALADEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARQUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Staley, H.A. "Skip", Phillips, Craig G. and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0009

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Phillips, Craig G.

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALADEZ, REYES SIERRA

Defendant

MARQUEZ, SOCORRO

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 05/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Staley, H.A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: PROOF OF SEVICE FILED; Parties Present Plaintiff: VALADEZ, REYES SIERRA

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/ORIGINAL RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketMemo of Costs / Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Original Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: As to Socorro Marquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: VALADEZ, REYES SIERRA; Awarded Against: MARQUEZ, SOCORRO; Amount; Damages: $10,000.00; Costs: $160.00; Total: $10160.00; Party: Names: VALADEZ, REYES SIERRA; MARQUEZ, SOCORRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims) Mailed To Both Parties 5/8/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 05/04/2017: Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: PROOF OF SEVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: Personal Service as to Socorro Marquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: VALADEZ, REYES SIERRA; Served: 03/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.