This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/27/2019 at 13:32:46 (UTC).

V & J ENTERPRISES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION VS JON LIFQUIST IN HIS CAPACITY AS RECORDER OF THE COUNTY OF KERN

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 V J ENTERPRISES, INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JON LIFQUIST IN HIS CAPACITY AS RECORDER OF THE COUNTY OF KERN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3418

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

V & J ENTERPRISES, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION

Defendants

THE COUNTY OF KERN, CALIFORNIA

RED PARNERSHIPS I-X

DOES I-X, JOHN

DOES I-X, JANE

BLACK CORPORATIONS I-X

JON LIFQUIST IN HIS CAPACITY AS RECORDER OF THE COUNTY OF KERN

JOHN LIFQUIST IN HIS CAPACITY AS ASSESSOR OF THE COUNTY OF KERN

WHITE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANIES I-X

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON, JARED

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re:3.110 Hearing Date: 3/23/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re:3.110 Hearing Date: 3/23/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.