Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 08:58:11 (UTC).

UTAH PACIFIC BRIDGE & STEEL VS SECURITY PAVING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 UTAH PACIFIC BRIDGE STEEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SECURITY PAVING COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1021

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UTAH PACIFIC BRIDGE & STEEL, LTD., A UTAH CORPORATION

Defendants

CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

SECURITY PAVING COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

CALTRANS DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION; A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC AGENCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CADE, NATHANAEL P

GREEN, SCOTT THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 05/28/2021: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/24/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 05/28/2021: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement - Conditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 08/24/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECURITY PAVING COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Continental Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CADE NATHANAEL PHILIPPE