Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:14:11 (UTC).

USSERY VS HARTMAN

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 USSERY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HARTMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Brumfield, Lorna H.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0459

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

USSERY, VITALIIA

Defendants

HARTMAN, BRIAN

HARTMAN, ELIZABETH LYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLLACK, JASON A

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, SHYLA M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POLLACK, JASON A; Defendant; Attorney: SMITH, SHYLA M; Defendant; Attorney: SMITH, SHYLA M

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Jury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: t/e 4 to 5 days jury for both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Final Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: j/t & fcmc set 10/3/16 dept 11 9am t/e 4 to 5 days jury for both sides

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice as to entire action of all parties and all causes of action. Each party to bear their own fees and costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: POLLACK, JASON A; Defendant; Attorney: SMITH, SHYLA M; Defendant; Attorney: SMITH, SHYLA M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Jury Non-refundable fee pursuant to CCP 631 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Filed by Shyla Smith, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Jason A. Pollack, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Case Management Statement - Comment: Filed by Shyla Smith, Esq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ELIZABETH LYN HARTMAN;PERSONAL SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO BRIAN HARTMAN; PERSONAL SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Amendment to Complaint - Comment: Doe 1: Elizabeth Lyn Hartman ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/30/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less