This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 22:45:59 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST VS BAREFIELD

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed an Other lawsuit against BAREFIELD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lua, John W. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0017

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lua, John W.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Appellant

BAREFIELD, DEBRA

Respondent

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF10 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

NAIMAN, RANDALL D

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 02/20/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRespondents Brief Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketAppellant's Opening Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 02/20/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPetition - Comment: for Writ of Supersedeas; Points & Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketAppellant's Opening Brief Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Records Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Appeal and Briefing Schedule

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketReporter's Transcript on Appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketClerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: on Defendant-Appellant Deborah Barefield's Emergency Verified Petition for Restraining Order Pending Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketPetition - Comment: for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAppeal from Case Number - Comment: BCL-19-010394

    Read MoreRead Less