This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 17:22:36 (UTC).

UPLAND CONTRACTING, INC. VS CLS CONSTRUCTORS, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 UPLAND CONTRACTING, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLS CONSTRUCTORS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0581

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UPLAND CONTRACTING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UPLAND CONTRACTING, INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SIERRA SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, A MISSOURI CORPORATION

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION

CLS CONSTRUCTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CLS CONSTRUCTORS, INC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

CLS CONSTRUCTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, A MISSOUI CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHAUER, ROBERT F

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MCLOUGHLIN, STEPHEN MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 6/25/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Request for Dismissal - Entire cannot be Dismissed - Cross-Complaint Pending

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: CRC 3.1385 *to be heard with CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: As to Cross-Complaint ONLY - With Prejudice - Returned via First Legal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: 9/10/18 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: As to Complaint - ONLY - With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Request for Dismissal - Entire cannot be Dismissed - Cross-Complaint Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 06/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO CLS CONSTRUCTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY, A TEXAS CORPORATION, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, A MISSOURI CORPORATION, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO SIERRA SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC ENTITY, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Served: 04/12/2018; Served: 04/12/2018; Served: 04/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 6/25/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UPLAND CONTRACTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SIERRA SANDS UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant