This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/18/2023 at 07:58:54 (UTC).

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY VS DIAZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIAZ,. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0085

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendants

MIRELES, MARTIN

DIAZ, PHILLIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS MARK R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/14/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

11/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

11/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Statement of Classification and Location

11/14/2022: Statement of Classification and Location

Declaration

11/14/2022: Declaration

Order to Show Cause

11/14/2022: Order to Show Cause

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

12/21/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Letter Mailed

02/17/2023: Letter Mailed

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

02/16/2023: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Case Management Statement

04/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

05/16/2023: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Judgment by Default by Court

05/16/2023: Judgment by Default by Court

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

05/16/2023: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

05/16/2023: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Declaration for Default

05/16/2023: Declaration for Default

Declaration for Default

05/16/2023: Declaration for Default

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Declaration for Default; Comment: Declaration for Default; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Declaration for Default; Comment: Declaration for Default; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered; Comment: Request for Entry of Default; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Comment: Case Management Statement/with proof of service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Letter Mailed; Comment: Minute Order; Filed By: DEFENDANT - MIRELES, MARTIN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023
View Court Documents

HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Lamont Division B; Result: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Martin Mireles; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Notice of Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 02/16/2023Hearing Time: 1:30PMHearing Department/Division: B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Statement of Damages; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Comment: Statement of Classification and Location/Venue; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Comment: Summons; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less