This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 12/18/2022 at 07:49:13 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC VS SIMPKINS, JR.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SIMPKINS, JR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3785

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC

Defendant

SIMPKINS, JEROME D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN JOHN P

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

09/20/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Memorandum of Costs

08/22/2022: Memorandum of Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment

11/05/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Writ of Execution Issued

09/14/2021: Writ of Execution Issued

Memorandum of Costs

08/27/2021: Memorandum of Costs

Abstract Issued

03/24/2021: Abstract Issued

Judgment by Default by Court

01/29/2021: Judgment by Default by Court

Order

01/29/2021: Order

Order

01/29/2021: Order

Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

01/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

09/14/2020: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

09/10/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

09/10/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Declaration

09/08/2020: Declaration

Statement of Classification and Location

09/08/2020: Statement of Classification and Location

Summons Issued and Filed

09/10/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

09/08/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Complaint

09/08/2020: Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: A Writ for this County was previously issued on 9/07/2022. A Writ can only be issued once every 180 days for the same county.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Writ of Execution; County of Kern; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs; Comment: After Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Comment: As to Jerome D Simpinks Jr. Judgment entered 1/29/2021; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Writ of Execution Issued; Comment: Sacramento County; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Abstract Issued; Comment: Abstract of Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Comment: Against Jerome D Simpkins Jr.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order; Comment: Granting Attorney Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order; Comment: Granting use of Copies in lieu of the Original Contract.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: As to Does 1 to 5 inclusive, only.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment; Comment: As to Jerome D Simpkins Jr. on complaint filed 9/8/2020; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Re: Re; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFUND CCR LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenosian, John P