This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 11:20:55 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC VS FANTAUZZI

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FANTAUZZI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9148

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC

Defendant

FANTAUZZI, TOMAS I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENSEN CASEY M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Complaint

11/27/2019: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

12/02/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

11/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Statement of Classification and Location

11/27/2019: Statement of Classification and Location

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

12/02/2019: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

12/02/2019: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Declaration of Non-Service

12/05/2019: Declaration of Non-Service

Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

06/30/2020: Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

Request for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay)

02/23/2021: Request for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay)

Ruling

05/04/2020: Ruling

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

06/02/2020: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Ruling

07/01/2020: Ruling

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d); Dept.: Taft Division A (Etienne); Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration of Non-Service; Comment: as to Tomas I Fantauzzi aka Tomas Fantauzzi, 1 attempt.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Statement of Classification and Location; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - UNIFUND CCR, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less