This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 08:54:43 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS WEISBERG

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WEISBERG. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Witt, Gary R., Phillips, Craig G. and Turner, Jerold L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Witt, Gary R.

Phillips, Craig G.

Turner, Jerold L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

WEISBERG, ROBERT K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 03/12/2020: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Notice of OSC re 3.110 (N20): Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal: Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Hearing moved per Standing Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed - Comment: Regarding Notice of Change of Hearing Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Turner, Jerold L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 03/12/2020: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Continuance of Future Hearings to Allow Plaintiff Additional Time To Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Taft-Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) - Portal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Of Transfer in. Kern County Case Number Issued TCL-20-000002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Minute Order issued by Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: ORDER GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, it is ordered this case be transferred to the Superior Court of California County of Kern - Taft/Maricopa Branch.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Case to appropirate Court (Change Venue) Under CCP 396(b); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of John P. Kenosian Filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court - Chatsworth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: General Order Re Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedures; Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee Filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Order to Show Cause Hearing filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Summons Issued by Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRegister of Actions / Docket Change of Venue - Comment: Transfer in from Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: Filed in Los Angeles County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.