This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:41 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS VANESSA GARCIA AKA VANESSA ROSALES

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VANESSA GARCIA AKA VANESSA ROSALES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1823

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

VANESSA GARCIA AKA VANESSA ROSALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: In Support of Judgment Civ. Code 1788.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: As to Vanessa Garcia aka Vanessa Rosales

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1 - 5 inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO VANESSA GARCIA AKA VANESSA ROSALES , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less