This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:48:44 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS STEPHEN H MILANO AKA STEPHEN H MILANO JR

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEPHEN H MILANO AKA STEPHEN H MILANO JR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1825

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

STEPHEN H MILANO AKA STEPHEN H MILANO JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN, JOHN P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: County of Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: ISSUED/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Awarded Against: STEPHEN H MILANO AKA STEPHEN H MILANO JR; Amount; Damages: $4,903.66; Costs: $246.00; Total: $5149.66; Party: Names: UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; STEPHEN H MILANO AKA STEPHEN H MILANO JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO STEPHAN H MILANO AKA STEPHAN H MILANO JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: CCP 1788.50

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO STEPHEN H MILANO AKA STPHAN H MILANO JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO STEPHEN H MILANO , PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: REDUCED FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less