This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 09:59:42 (UTC).

TYSON ET AL VS MAPLES

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 TYSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAPLES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Lampe, David R. and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1770

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOSEY, BRYSON

TYSON, LATIANA S.

HOSEY, BRY'ANNA

Defendant

MAPLES, TERRY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAUMAN, SHAUN J

Defendant Attorney

MACDONALD, SCOTT L

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/04/2021: Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3.1385 - cont'd from 5/25/21

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/25/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/26/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/12/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 3.1385 - cont'd from 5/25/21, 8/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/04/2021: Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 3.1385 - cont'd from 5/25/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Shaun Bauman re: OSC re Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Judge Barmann, Dept 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Ruling on Order to Show Cause held 5/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 05/25/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Shaun Bauman re: OSC Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Judge Lampe Dept. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: Notice of Jury Deposit - $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to Complaint - $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/12/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACDONALD SCOTT L. ESQ.