This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/21/2018 at 14:13:20 (UTC).

TWO JINN, INC. DBA ALADDIN BAIL BONDS VS ROBBINS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/26/2016 TWO JINN, INC DBA ALADDIN BAIL BONDS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBBINS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K., Green, Kenneth R., Jr., Bittleston, Dawn and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0520

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

Bittleston, Dawn

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWO JINN, INC. DBA ALADDIN BAIL BONDS

Defendants

DUNBAR, MARJORIE

ROBBINS, JERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMS, RALPH L

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for dismissal (partial ) and proof of service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: TWO JINN, INC. DBA ALADDIN BAIL BONDS; Awarded Against: ROBBINS, JERRY; DUNBAR, MARJORIE; Amount; Damages: $1,515.00; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 0.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Attorney Fees: $303.00; Costs: $435.00; Total: $2253.00; Party: Names: TWO JINN, INC. DBA ALADDIN BAIL BONDS; ROBBINS, JERRY; DUNBAR, MARJORIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: Mail to Law Offices of Ralph L. Sims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County. Mail to Law Offices of Ralph L. Sims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Notice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Request for dismissal (partial ) and proof of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: :Exhibit book

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: FOR MARJORIE DUNBAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): NO PROOF OF SERVICE FOR MARJORIE DUNBAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Statement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.